Harrison, Donald John Harold (CPSO#: 18105)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Thai

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Weber Clinic 1400 Weber Street East Kitchener, ON N2A 3Z8
Date Received: 08 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015