Harrison, Mariam Nabil (CPSO#: 84733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville Respirology Clinic
114 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 0E1
Phone: (613) 968-9000
Fax: (613) 968-9006
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Belleville General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
and Critical Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mariam Nabil Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Harrison ( CPSO# 84733 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare Corp
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
114 St. Paul Street
Belleville ON  K8N 0E1
Phone Number: (613) 968-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAM NABIL HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 29 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Sep 2009 to 12 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 13 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2012