Harrison, Mark Marshall (CPSO#: 61380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Room 351, Nickle 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4537
Fax: (613) 548-1345
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark M. Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Harrison ( CPSO# 61380 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Nickle 3, Room 351
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK MARSHALL HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1992