Harrison, Ross Elwood (CPSO#: 20891)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 1988