Harriss, Julian Paul (CPSO#: 71764)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 27 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010