Harrop, Alan Robertson (CPSO#: 67642)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1997