Harry, Philip Valentine (CPSO#: 23670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
699a Lawrence Ave West
Toronto ON  M5T1B7
Phone: 6479386017
Fax: 4167815923
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP VALENTINE HARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980