Hart, Alexander (CPSO#: 103570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Room C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.   Alexander   Hart   shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program  in which Dr. Hart is enrolled at
                  the University of Toronto.

            (2)   In Dr. Hart's practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Hart  shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients  or  out-patients  of  a
                  clinical  teaching  unit  that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Hart is properly  practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned  by the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Hart's practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Hart shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr.  Hart  may practise emergency medicine  and  to  the  extent  of  his
                  employment  at  Grey  Bruce  Health  Services  Owen  Sound,  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Hart's  practice  specified  in  paragraph  (4),  Dr. Hart may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of  registration expires, and Dr. Hart must  thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Hart is no  longer  enrolled  in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Hart  no  longer  holds Canadian citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or a valid employment  authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Hart  must  immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education program  if  any  one  of  the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the  supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns  regarding  Dr.  Hart's  practice,  including  but not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Hart's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval   for   Dr.   Hart  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Hart's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Hart takes  a  leave  of  absence,  or  transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the  event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate   Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Hart  may  not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate  medical education program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy  until  Dr.  Hart  applies  for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is issued on November 21, 2017.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this  certificate  of  registration  expires  on June 30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.