Hart, Ian Ritchie (CPSO#: 22071)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Glasgow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 1998