Hart, John Thomas (CPSO#: 21163)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northwestern University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1996