Hart, Leon Andre (CPSO#: 75666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tawam Hospital
Emergency Department
P O Box 15258
Al Ain 00000
United Arab Emirates
Phone: (50) 831-6285

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEON ANDRE HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006