Hart, Michelle Allegra (CPSO#: 84929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest
Geriatric Health Care System
3560 Bathurst Street
Hospital Suite 5W26
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 5357
Fax: (416) 785-4206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hart ( CPSO# 84929 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Suite 5W26
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ALLEGRA HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008