Hart, Paul Michael (CPSO#: 65000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King West Medical
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone: (905) 525-3508
Fax: (905) 528-5468
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grafham Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hart ( CPSO# 65000 )
Dr. M. Grafham ( CPSO# 62178 )

Business Address:
King West Medical Associates
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501


Corporation Name: Dr. P. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hart ( CPSO# 65000 )

Business Address:
King West Medical
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MICHAEL HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993