Harterre, Trevor Donald (CPSO#: 69010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6340
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Samson & Dr. Trevor Harterre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Harterre ( CPSO# 69010 )
Dr. J. Samson ( CPSO# 69016 )

Business Address:
Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-6340

Business Address:
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (205) 264-1313

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR DONALD HARTERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTERRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1997