Harth, Manfred (CPSO#: 20519)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Services (London) Ltd. 100 Piccadilly St London ON N6A 1R8
Date Received: 09 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017