Hartleib, Michael Charles (CPSO#: 72592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
327 Charlotte Street
Suite 402
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone: 705 775-0320
Fax: (705) 775-0128
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael C. Hartleib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hartleib ( CPSO# 72592 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
Suite 402
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 775-0320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHARLES HARTLEIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTLEIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2002