Hartley, Elizabeth Jane (CPSO#: 50690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4054
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hartley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hartley ( CPSO# 50690 )

Business Address:
Centenary Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE HARTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1983