Hartman, Alexander (CPSO#: 50691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-5926
Fax: (905) 881-6284
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-2636
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HARTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1983