Hartman, Paul Gordon Richard (CPSO#: 93235)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 12 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2015