Hartman, Sandra Elizabeth (CPSO#: 25281)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012