Harvey, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 55086)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Division Of Nephrology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 204516
Fax: (416) 813-6271
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN HARVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARVEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988