Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Harvey, Janice Anne (CPSO#: 56941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K4
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 20270
Fax: 905-540-9383
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2630 Skymark Ave
Mississauga ON  L4W 5A4
Canada
Phone: 905-629-0900 Ext. 332
Fax: 888-843-2372
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE ANNE HARVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARVEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989