Harvey, Thomas Jerome (CPSO#: 17985)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2003