Hasan, Farah Akhtar (CPSO#: 71439)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 May 2004

Summary

Former Names: Akhtar Hasan, Farah Nahid (used until: 20 Jun 1999 )     Akhtar, Farah Nahid (used until: 18 Feb 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 2004