Hasan, Shabih Ul (CPSO#: 53258)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2000