Hasan, Shubbar Mohamed Shubbar (CPSO#: 74519)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Princess Margaret Hospital - UHN
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2131
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 21 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2005