Hasanni, Sameer Abass Hasan (CPSO#: 83646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: Hasanni, Sameer Abbass Hasan (used until: 29 Apr 2015 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Division of Critical Care Medicine
103 Hospital Dr, Saskatoon, Sk
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
New Brunswick
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER ABASS HASAN HASANNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASANNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 06 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 07 Oct 2006 to 06 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 07 Oct 2007 to 06 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 07 Oct 2008 to 06 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 07 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2015