Hasegawa, Brian James (CPSO#: 58293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
156 Waterloo Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 4B4
Phone: (519) 271-6711
Fax: (519) 271-8533
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Hasegawa and Nancy Whitmore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2012


Corporation Name: Brian Hasegawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hasegawa ( CPSO# 58293 )

Business Address:
156 Waterloo Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 4B4
Phone Number: (519) 271-6711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN JAMES HASEGAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASEGAWA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1988