Hasegawa, Naomi Anne (CPSO#: 63627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 240
315 Brunswick Boulevard
Pointe-Claire QC  H9R 5M7
Phone: (514) 694-2010
Fax: (514) 694-0772

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI ANNE HASEGAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASEGAWA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1992