Hasey, Gary Marcel (CPSO#: 43872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Centre for Mountain Health Services
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35448
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY MARCEL HASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1985