Hashim, Almoutaz Hashim Abdu (CPSO#: 82294)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2005 to 27 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008