Hashim, Jomana Talal J (CPSO#: 100106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2013

Expiry Date:  22 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055259140
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOMANA TALAL J HASHIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HASHIM is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. HASHIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HASHIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HASHIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HASHIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HASHIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 22 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 10 May 2013 to 25 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Dec 2017