Hashmatullah, Syed (CPSO#: 102007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  01 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Psychiatry
PO Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Fax: 5193723945
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Munshi ( CPSO# 90302 )
Dr. S. Hashmatullah ( CPSO# 102007)

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department of Psychiatry
P.O. Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Frontenac Clinical Services
Department of Psychiatry
385 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1B9
Phone Number: (613) 544-1356

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Syed  Hashmatullah  may  practise  psychiatry with Grey Bruce Health
                  Services in Owen Sound, Ontario, and under supervision coordinated by Dr.
                  John J. Lucas.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  on  September  1,
                  2018.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Hashmatullah's knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude, does not
                        provide the required reports to the College by the  due  date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Hashmatullah's practice.
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on November 1, 2016 and will expire  on  or
                  before September 1, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.