Hashmi, Mir Aijaz Ali (CPSO#: 61311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2W 105
555 East Tachevah Drive
Palm Springs CA  92262
United States
Phone: (760) 318-8100
Fax: (866) 572-8314

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIR AIJAZ ALI HASHMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990