Hashmi, Sajjad Ahmad (CPSO#: 80351)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Apr 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2003 to 04 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 11 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005