Hasic, Aida (CPSO#: 79217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 109
6750 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 4C4
Phone: (905) 997-3080
Fax: (905) 997-3088
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aida Hasic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hasic ( CPSO# 79217 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
6750 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 997-3080

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIDA HASIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003