Haskins, Michael Samuel (CPSO#: 23630)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jan 1997