Hasnain, Haider (CPSO#: 64959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 979-5260
Fax: (519) 979-8085
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2425 Tecumseh Road East Suite 102
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Canada
Phone: 519-944-1344
Fax: 519-915-4979
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

NEMAK
4900 G. N. Booth Drive
Windsor ON  N9C4G8
Canada
Phone: 519-995-4525
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hasnain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hasnain ( CPSO# 64959 )

Business Address:
Unit 101
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-5260


Corporation Name: Hasnain, Sekhon and Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 14 May 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Dr. Haider Hasnain (September 21, 2016) Allegations of professional misconduct by Dr. Hasnain have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. In 2009 and 2010, it is alleged that Dr. Hasnain engaged in in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and in the sexual abuse of Ms. A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): July 3-6, 30, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 14 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As of May 14, 2018, Dr. Hasnain does not have an approved Clinical Supervisor
            in accordance with the Undertaking dated May 19, 2017. As such, until such time
            as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College, he shall
            not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer
            any of the following substances:

                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                  (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
                  
                  
            As from May 19, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Haider Hasnain, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hasnain to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                                                of
                                    DR.  HAIDER HASNAIN
                                          ("Dr. Hasnain")
                                                to
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hasnain, certificate of registration number 64959, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.
                  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that the College conducted a re-assessment of
                  my family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (iii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (iv)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
            Phase 1

                        (v)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every week, for the first month
                              of supervision;
                  
                        (vi)  Directly observe my patient encounters for  1/2 a day per
                              week;
                  
                        (vii) Review the charts for all patients who are being prescribed
                              narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                              benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and all other
                              monitored drugs at every meeting and discuss any concerns
                              arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (viii)review 5 charts of patients who are not being seen for
                              chronic non-malignant pain and discuss any concerns arising
                              from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (ix)  At the end of the first month, the Clinical Supervisor will
                              be asked to recommend whether I can move to the next phase of
                              supervision, subject to the approval of the College.
            Phase 2

                        (x)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, on a bi-weekly basis, for two
                              months;
                  
                        (xi)  Review the charts for all patients who are being prescribed
                              narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                              benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and all other
                              monitored drugs at every meeting and discuss any concerns
                              arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (xii) review 10 charts of patients who are not being seen for
                              chronic non-malignant pain and discuss any concerns arising
                              from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (xiii)At the end of two months of bi-weekly supervision, the
                              Clinical Supervisor will be asked to recommend whether I can
                              move to the next phase of supervision, subject to the
                              approval of the College.
            Phase 3
                        (xiv) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, on a monthly basis, for eight
                              months;
                  
                        (xv)  Review 20 charts for patients who are being prescribed
                              narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                              benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and all other
                              monitored drugs at every meeting and discuss any concerns
                              arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (xvi) review 20 charts of patients who are not being seen for
                              chronic non-malignant pain and discuss any concerns arising
                              from the chart reviews;
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        reassessment report dated August 2, 2016, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Hasnain, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College, I will not issue new prescriptions or
                        renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                        substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
                  
                        and as amended from time to time. 
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Hasnain, agree that if I am required to cease issuing new
                        prescriptions or renewing existing prescriptions for or
                        administering any of the substances as described in section (5)(g)
                        above, this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my
                        certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation
                        will be included on the public register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   the following courses: 
                  
                              1)    the University of Toronto's Safe Opioid Prescribing
                                    Course (three webinars) and
                  
                              2)    the Harvard Medical School Course: Evaluating and
                                    Treating Pain.
                  
                        (ii)  a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1)    Addiction Medicine and Pain Management and
                  
                              2)    Psychopharmacology. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to complete this requirement  within six
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hasnain, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hasnain, hereby consent to any of the following being
                        included on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations
                        on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23
                        of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice; and
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hasnain, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hasnain, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Hasnain was the subject of a College re-assessment of his
                              family practice. As a result of the re-assessment:
                  
                              *     Dr. Hasnain will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                                    twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              *     Dr. Hasnain's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within six (6) months
                                    of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Hasnain, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education  and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Hasnain, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Hasnain, give my irrevocable consent to any person who requires
                  this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the
                  Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment; 
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking: and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            E.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (22)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (23)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (24)  I, Dr. Hasnain, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 13, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: May 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Haider Hasnain to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective May 19, 2017:

Dr. Hasnain was the subject of a College re-assessment of his family practice. As a result of the re-assessment:

- Dr. Hasnain will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

- Dr. Hasnain's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)