Hassam, Imtiaz Kassamali (CPSO#: 70577)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 18 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015