Hassan, Ahmed Nabeel M (CPSO#: 88190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH, 100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34051
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahmed N. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan ( CPSO# 88190 )

Business Address:
CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Suite 3307
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED NABEEL M HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013