Hassan, Ali Hussain Ali Mohammad (CPSO#: 67378)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000