Hassan, Ali Nabeel (CPSO#: 69649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Phone: (519) 756-2512
Fax: (519) 756-3125
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan ( CPSO# 69649 )

Business Address:
Suite 001
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Phone Number: (519) 756-2512

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 23, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ali Nabeel Hassan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hassan to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Hassan is prohibited from prescribing the following drugs, substances
                  and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended
                  from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 Relinquished

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        Relinquished

            All Other Monitored Drugs
            (as defined under the Narcotic Safety and  Relinquished
            Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)

            Dr. Hassan shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his
            Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Hassan must not prescribe
            Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
            other targeted substances, and/or all other Monitored Drugs. Further
            information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
            website at www.cpso.on.ca". The sign shall be translated into any language(s)
            in which Dr. Hassan provides services and posted in the waiting rooms of all
            his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible location.