Hassan, Amal Ali (CPSO#: 74827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 272-6776
Fax: (905) 272-1566
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amal Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hassan ( CPSO# 74827 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 272-6776

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMAL ALI HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002