Hassan, Hanadi Abdel Rahim Ahmed (CPSO#: 87565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alliston Family Health Team
Windsor Health Centre
P O Box 280
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1V5
Phone: (705) 435-8887
Fax: (705) 435-8867
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanadi Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hassan ( CPSO# 87565 )

Business Address:
Alliston Family Health Team
Windsor Health Centre
P O Box 280
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1V5
Phone Number: (705) 435-8887

Business Address:
30 Dunham Drive
Alliston ON  L9R 0G1
Phone Number: (705) 434-2141

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANADI ABDEL RAHIM AHMED HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009