Hassan, Nesreen Mohamed Abd ElMonem (CPSO#: 88169)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Minya, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2008 to 28 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 29 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009