Hassan, Sameh (CPSO#: 51014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3300 Yonge Street
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M4N 2L6
Phone: (416) 481-2280
Fax: (416) 481-0593
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hassan ( CPSO# 51014 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
3300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2L6
Phone Number: (416) 481-2280

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEH HASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1984