Hassanlou, Mojgan (CPSO#: 86409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416)480-4762
Fax: (416)480-4481
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Toronto ON  L3Y9A2
Canada
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1101 Kingston Road
Unit 230
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mojgan Hassanlou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hassanlou ( CPSO# 86409 )

Business Address:
Unit 44
16945 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Phone Number: (905) 235-8055

Business Address:
Suite 230
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 235-8055

Business Address:
202C - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJGAN HASSANLOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANLOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013