Hassard, Frank Alfred (CPSO#: 70052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
565 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3L3
Phone: (905) 735-4600
Fax: (905) 735-6031
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Swayne Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 1K5
Canada
Phone: (905) 372-2245
Fax: (905) 372-2242
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Hassard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2013


Corporation Name: Hassard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hassard ( CPSO# 70052 )

Business Address:
565 King Street
Welland ON  L3B 3L3
Phone Number: (905) 735-4600

Business Address:
60 Swayne Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 1K5
Phone Number: (905) 372-2245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK ALFRED HASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2001