Hassard, Philip Victor (CPSO#: 66619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 746-5393
Fax: (613) 746-4840
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hassard & Rodrigue Medicine Professional Corporation/Hassard et Rodrigue Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018


Corporation Name: P. V. Hassard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hassard ( CPSO# 66619 )

Business Address:
307-595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-5393

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP VICTOR HASSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997