Hassett, Patrick (CPSO#: 94763)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 15 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011